California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1440 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill July 24, 2017

Amended

Bill June 14, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017