|
07/18/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 69, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2400.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1712.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1427.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|