California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1460 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill June 30, 2017

Chaptered

Bill July 17, 2017

Amended

Bill June 12, 2017
Bill May 30, 2017
Bill April 24, 2017