|
09/11/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 229, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 2757.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2177.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 1426.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|