California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1487 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2017

Amended

Bill June 5, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017