|
10/13/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 761, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 2936.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2343.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 1470.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|