California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1491 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2017

Amended

Bill August 22, 2017
Bill July 3, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017
Bill March 27, 2017