|
09/05/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 248, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6350.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5280.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3868.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1005.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|