|
10/12/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 721, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2940.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2336.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1386.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|