California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2017

Amended

Bill June 21, 2017
Bill June 8, 2017