|
10/03/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 451, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3012.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2350.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1621.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|