California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1550 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2017

Amended

Bill July 13, 2017
Bill April 18, 2017
Bill March 16, 2017