Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 2060.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1852.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1851.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|