California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1575 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Amended

Bill July 10, 2017
Bill June 26, 2017
Bill June 21, 2017
Bill May 30, 2017
Bill April 27, 2017
Bill April 20, 2017
Bill March 30, 2017