|
09/26/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6980.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5897.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5283.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3797.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|