California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1584 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2018

Amended

Bill August 23, 2018
Bill June 4, 2018
Bill January 3, 2018
Bill March 28, 2017