|
09/30/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5946.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2060.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|