California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1597 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill July 3, 2018
Bill June 11, 2018
Bill June 22, 2017