|
09/11/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 231, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 2873.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 2872.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2302.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 1649.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|