California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1613 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2017

Amended

Bill July 5, 2017
Bill June 14, 2017
Bill April 19, 2017