|
10/15/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 851, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 8. Page 3504.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (September 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3371.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2858.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 5. Page 2061.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Measure version as amended on May 2 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|