|
10/12/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 688, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 3363.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2760.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 9. Page 1639.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1535.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|