California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill June 6, 2017
Bill May 15, 2017