California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1711 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Assembly Bill No. 1711 CHAPTER 92 An act to add Section 19771.5 to the Government Code, relating to public employment. [ Approved by Governor July 21, 2017. Filed with Secretary of State July 21, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1711, Committee on Veterans Affairs. State military reserve personnel: leave benefits.Existing law provides for leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service for executive branch employees who are members of the Armed Forces, the National Guard, or the Naval Militia, as specified.This bill would provide that a member of the State Military Reserve be granted military leave and other specified benefits on the same basis as a member of the National Guard or other military reserve member.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 19771.5 is added to the Government Code, to read:19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.
1+Enrolled July 06, 2017 Passed IN Senate July 03, 2017 Passed IN Assembly May 18, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1711Introduced by Committee on Veterans AffairsMarch 06, 2017 An act to add Section 19771.5 to the Government Code, relating to public employment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1711, Committee on Veterans Affairs. State military reserve personnel: leave benefits.Existing law provides for leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service for executive branch employees who are members of the Armed Forces, the National Guard, or the Naval Militia, as specified.This bill would provide that a member of the State Military Reserve be granted military leave and other specified benefits on the same basis as a member of the National Guard or other military reserve member.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 19771.5 is added to the Government Code, to read:19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.
22
3- Assembly Bill No. 1711 CHAPTER 92 An act to add Section 19771.5 to the Government Code, relating to public employment. [ Approved by Governor July 21, 2017. Filed with Secretary of State July 21, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1711, Committee on Veterans Affairs. State military reserve personnel: leave benefits.Existing law provides for leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service for executive branch employees who are members of the Armed Forces, the National Guard, or the Naval Militia, as specified.This bill would provide that a member of the State Military Reserve be granted military leave and other specified benefits on the same basis as a member of the National Guard or other military reserve member.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
3+ Enrolled July 06, 2017 Passed IN Senate July 03, 2017 Passed IN Assembly May 18, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1711Introduced by Committee on Veterans AffairsMarch 06, 2017 An act to add Section 19771.5 to the Government Code, relating to public employment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1711, Committee on Veterans Affairs. State military reserve personnel: leave benefits.Existing law provides for leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service for executive branch employees who are members of the Armed Forces, the National Guard, or the Naval Militia, as specified.This bill would provide that a member of the State Military Reserve be granted military leave and other specified benefits on the same basis as a member of the National Guard or other military reserve member.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled July 06, 2017 Passed IN Senate July 03, 2017 Passed IN Assembly May 18, 2017
6+
7+Enrolled July 06, 2017
8+Passed IN Senate July 03, 2017
9+Passed IN Assembly May 18, 2017
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
412
513 Assembly Bill No. 1711
6-CHAPTER 92
14+
15+Introduced by Committee on Veterans AffairsMarch 06, 2017
16+
17+Introduced by Committee on Veterans Affairs
18+March 06, 2017
719
820 An act to add Section 19771.5 to the Government Code, relating to public employment.
9-
10- [ Approved by Governor July 21, 2017. Filed with Secretary of State July 21, 2017. ]
1121
1222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1323
1424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1525
1626 AB 1711, Committee on Veterans Affairs. State military reserve personnel: leave benefits.
1727
1828 Existing law provides for leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service for executive branch employees who are members of the Armed Forces, the National Guard, or the Naval Militia, as specified.This bill would provide that a member of the State Military Reserve be granted military leave and other specified benefits on the same basis as a member of the National Guard or other military reserve member.
1929
2030 Existing law provides for leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service for executive branch employees who are members of the Armed Forces, the National Guard, or the Naval Militia, as specified.
2131
2232 This bill would provide that a member of the State Military Reserve be granted military leave and other specified benefits on the same basis as a member of the National Guard or other military reserve member.
2333
2434 ## Digest Key
2535
2636 ## Bill Text
2737
2838 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 19771.5 is added to the Government Code, to read:19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.
2939
3040 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3141
3242 ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3343
3444 SECTION 1. Section 19771.5 is added to the Government Code, to read:19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.
3545
3646 SECTION 1. Section 19771.5 is added to the Government Code, to read:
3747
3848 ### SECTION 1.
3949
4050 19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.
4151
4252 19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.
4353
4454 19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.
4555
4656
4757
4858 19771.5. For purposes of this chapter, members of the State Military Reserve shall be granted leave for military service, rights and benefits accrued during that service, and reinstatement after that service by their appointing power on the same basis as members of the National Guard or other military reserve personnel.