|
10/02/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 418, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2943.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2348.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1719.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|