California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1714 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2017

Amended

Bill August 21, 2017
Bill June 19, 2017
Bill May 11, 2017
Bill May 9, 2017