|
09/21/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 627, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6077.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6003.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 26. Noes 4. Page 6002.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4898.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|