California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1772 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill June 19, 2018
Bill April 11, 2018