|
09/06/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6365.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5270.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4893.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 4773.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|