California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1776 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 26, 2018
Bill June 12, 2018
Bill April 12, 2018