|
08/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 162, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 6134.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5036.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 4. Page 5157.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5094.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|