California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1782 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 7, 2018

Chaptered

Bill August 20, 2018

Amended

Bill June 26, 2018
Bill May 10, 2018
Bill April 19, 2018