|
09/19/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 532, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6830.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5817.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5585.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|