California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1859 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2018

Amended

Bill August 22, 2018
Bill August 17, 2018
Bill May 3, 2018
Bill April 19, 2018