|
09/17/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 427, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 6831.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 5804.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 7. Page 5519.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|