California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1860 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2018

Amended

Bill August 20, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018