Senate
|
08/15/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 5542.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|