California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1862 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2018

Amended

Bill August 15, 2018
Bill August 7, 2018
Bill April 12, 2018
Bill March 21, 2018
Bill March 5, 2018