|
09/19/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 5549.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 11. Page 5390.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|