California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1877 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 11, 2018
Bill March 23, 2018
Bill February 22, 2018