|
09/27/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6813.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5702.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5392.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|