09/01/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 184, Statutes of 2017. | |||
09/01/2017 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/25/2017 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2173.). | ||
Senate | 06/26/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 841.) | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 21). | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2017 | Read first time. To print. |