|
09/23/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 708, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6786.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5909.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4790.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|