California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1914 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill July 5, 2018
Bill June 25, 2018
Bill June 14, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018