|
09/14/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 383, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 6887.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5888.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 4937.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|