California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1953 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2018

Amended

Bill August 21, 2018
Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 25, 2018
Bill June 4, 2018