|
09/30/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 940, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6993.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5967.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 1. Page 4561.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|