California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1976 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 26, 2018