|
10/08/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 575, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 2916.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2339.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 1908.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|