California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB20 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2017

Amended

Bill July 12, 2017
Bill April 24, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017